+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 13-N)
- Agreed to by House (80-Y 13-N)
- Engrossed by House
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (5-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 970592126