+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ581ER)
On January 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 14, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 058898284
On January 3, 2005 in the House:
- Prefiled & laid on Spkr's table;offered 01/12/05 058898284
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor