+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage
- Read third time
- Rejected by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment by Delegate Krupicka rejected
- Taken up
- Agreed to by House (58-Y 41-N)
- Engrossed by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (58-Y 41-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N)
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101631D