+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ574ER)
On February 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On December 30, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 056129534
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2005: VOTE: WAIVE READING R (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2005: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor