+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ57ER)
On January 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 11, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 10, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 020806844-E
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 020806844
- Prefiled; 01/07/02