+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 23, 1999 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 16, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ566ER)
On February 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Reading of conference report waived
On February 27, 1999 in the House:
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 991150264-H1
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
- VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 9-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (82-Y 9-N)
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Delegates: Hamilton, Orrock, Bennett
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Houck, Woods, Walker
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 991150264-H1
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute by voice vote
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 93-N 1-A)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (2-Y 93-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 991438264-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 991438264-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 991438264-S1
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 9, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed Bill reprinted 992723836-E
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Amendments by Mr. Hamilton agreed to
- Taken up
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Title replaced
- Agreed to by House (92-Y 6-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 992723836-E
On February 6, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 19, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 992723836
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 9-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (2-Y 93-N 1-A)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor