+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ564ER)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 8, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/14/15 15103247D