+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ558ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 970206254