+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 14, 1995 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ549ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD3711430-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3711430-H1
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD3711430-H1
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD6066430
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor