+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules (Subject matter referred to Senate Finance)
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 970080198-E
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 970080198