+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ543ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented & ordered printed 971809476
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (54)
Type:
Primary Sponsor