+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 34-N)
- Agreed to by House (59-Y 34-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Pending question ordered
- Taken up
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: #1 Constitutional
On December 15, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102217D
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (59-Y 34-N)
January 21, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (52)
Type:
Primary Sponsor