+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ534ER)
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On January 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 10, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Printed as engrossed 033620674-E
- Engrossed by House
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 033620674
- Prefiled; 11/14/02