+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ532ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3709184-H1
- Substitute bill reprinted LD3709184-H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD3709184-H1
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD3709184-H1
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD0257184