+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ532ER)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 11100802D
On December 6, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/12/11 11100802D