+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ527ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD6089464
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor