+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ526ER)
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 6, 2001 in the House:
- Taken up
- Committee substitute agreed to 014367660-H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 014367660-H1
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 5, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 014367660-H1
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/11/00 013029660
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2001: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor