+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ525ER)
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 12, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 015945820-E
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 015945820
- Prefiled; 12/11/00
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor