+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ517ER)
On January 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Rules suspended (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 12, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 014507612-E
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 014507612
- Prefiled; 12/06/00
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor