+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On February 27, 2011 in the House:
- Failed to pass in House
- No further action taken
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chair ruled bill not properly before Senate
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker ruled Senate substitute not germane
- Taken up
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute (29-Y 11-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ511S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105149D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 11105149D-S1
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ511H1
- Speaker ruled Amendment by Delegate Armstrong not germane
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104150D-H1
- Taken up
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104150D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On November 10, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100593D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 18, 2011: Agreed to by Senate with substitute (29-Y 11-N)
February 17, 2011: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
January 19, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2011: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor