+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Rejected (29-Y 65-N)
- Rejected by House (29-Y 65-N)
- Taken up
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On September 8, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On September 4, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On September 3, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On August 27, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Rules without recommendation (18-Y 0-N)
On August 14, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200687D
+ − Votes (2)
September 10, 2020: VOTE: Rejected (29-Y 65-N)
August 27, 2020: Reported from Rules without recommendation (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Dave A. LaRock
Type:
Primary Sponsor