+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Left in Rules
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rereferred to Rules
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- VOTE: MOTION REJECTED (31-Y 62-N)
- Motion to pass by indefinetly rejected (31-Y 62-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by until Monday, February 9, 2015
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 5-N)
On September 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100082D
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2015: VOTE: MOTION REJECTED (31-Y 62-N)
January 27, 2015: Reported from Rules (10-Y 5-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor