+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ465ER)
On March 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up for immediate consideration
On March 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Printed as engrossed 028655869-E
- Engrossed by House
On March 4, 2002 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 028655869