+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 12, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ459ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On March 8, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 004989608-E
On March 8, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 004989608