+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ453ER)
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On March 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On March 4, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006607912-E
On March 2, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 006607912