+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ446ER)
On March 10, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On March 6, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 065884380
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 065884380
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor