+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 6, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ441ER)
On January 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 16, 1995 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table LD1600160