+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ439ER)
On March 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 5, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 049161268
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 049161268