+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ435ER)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12105520D
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105520D