+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 14, 1995 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ431ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (9-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD0034480