+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ431ER)
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 084851692
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 084851692
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor