+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ428ER)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12100157D
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12100157D