+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Stricken from House calendar
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/97 977769376
+ − Vote
January 29, 1997: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor