+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ417ER)
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- VOTE: (36-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 065813340
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 065813340