+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 12, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ406ER)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006476928-E
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 006476928
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor