+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ405ER)
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 089016720
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 089016720