+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 1, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HR40ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 12-N 3-A)
- Agreed to by House (76-Y 12-N 3-A)
- Engrossed by House
- Amendments by Del. Hull rejected
- Taken up
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 2-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 036119674
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 12-N 3-A)
January 28, 2003: Reported from Rules (15-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor