+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ396ER)
On March 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On March 9, 2006 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 065805312
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 065805312
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor