+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 24, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ393ER)
On January 16, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 10, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 975895172
- Prefiled; 12/16/96