+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ383ER)
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 15, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 028329944-E
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 2002 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 028329944
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor