+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ375ER)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 14104126D
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14104126D