+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ374ER)
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 048093538
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 048093538