+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ373ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
- Introduced bill reprinted 064210520
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 064210520
+ − Sponsors (100)
Type:
Primary Sponsor