+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ372ER)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 985760340
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor