+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 22, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ37ER)
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 15, 2010 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 10100255D
On January 5, 2010 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/10 10100255D
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor