+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ368ER)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 048037428
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 048037428