+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ364ER)
On March 10, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
- Taken up
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On March 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On February 28, 1994 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor