+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ363ER)
On February 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Introduced bill reprinted 089029762
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 089029762
+ − Sponsors (130)
Type:
Primary Sponsor