+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2013 in Rules by voice vote
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 12105005D
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 12105005D