+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ357ER)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 24, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 065777554
On February 21, 2006 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 065777554
+ − Sponsors (58)
Type:
Primary Sponsor